EP0792262 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NZYM, INC. 1933 Davis Street, Suite 293 San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLONICK, Joel 1261A Sonoma Avenue Albany, CA 94707 / US | 02 /
LEIGHTON, Terrance, J. 3589 Walnut Street F Lafayette, CA 94549 / US | 03 /
YU, Ida, K. 2727 Marina Boulevard 214 San Leandro, CA 94577 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939128.5 | 09.11.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US14669 | Priority number, date | US19940339322 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339322 | US19940339323 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339323 | US19940339324 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339324 | US19940339325 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 339325 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9615104 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792262 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/18 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
A01N37/52 (EP);
A01N43/36 (EP);
A01N43/38 (EP);
A01N43/50 (EP);
A01N47/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG PHYTOPATHOGENER PILZERKRANKUNGEN | [1997/36] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING PHYTOPATHOGENIC FUNGI INFECTIONS | [1997/36] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MYCOSES PHYTOPATHOGENES | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 03.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/48] | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0366066 (TIDWELL RICHARD R ;GERATZ J DIETER (US); OHEMENG KWASI A (US); HAL) [X] 1-12 * column W *; | [X]WO9408580 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA ;TIDWELL RICHARD R (US); DYKSTRA CHRISTINE C () [X] 1-12 * column W *; | [X]US2277861 (EWINS,A.J. ET AL.) [X] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9210475 (DU PONT) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0375414 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]DE3606294 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [X]US3190801 (ARCAMONE,F. ET AL.) [X] 13-19 * see in particular col. 5, line 35 - col. 6, line 59 *; column W *; | [X]US4912199 (LOWN J WILLIAM ET AL) [X] 13,14 * column W *; | [X]US4738980 (ARCAMONE FEDERICO ET AL) [X] 13,14 * column W *; | [X]WO9220698 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION) [X] 13,14 * column W *; | [Y]WO9403434 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 13-19 * column W *; | [X] - JONES,S.K. ET AL., "Novel Pentamidine Analogs in the Treatment of Experimental Pneumocystis carnii Pneumonia", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (199006), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1026 - 1030, XP002007932 [X] 1-12 * column W * | [X] - DONKOR,I.O. ET AL., "Pentamidine Congeners 1. Synthesis of Cis- and Trans-Butamidine Analogues As Anti-Pneumocystis carinii Pneumonia Agents", BIOORG.&MED.CHEM.LETT., (1993), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 1137 - 1140, XP002007933 [X] 1-12 * column W * | [X] - CORY,M. ET AL., "Structure and DNA Binding Activity of Analogues of 1,5-Bis(4-amidinophenoxy)pentane (Pentamidine)", J.MED.CHEM., WASHINGTON, (1992), vol. 35, no. 3, pages 431 - 438, XP002007934 [X] 1-12 * column W * | [XP] - PILCH,D.S. ET AL., "Berenil [1,3-Bis-(4'-aimidinophenyl)triazene] Binding to DNA Duplexes and to a RNA Duplex : Evidence for Both Intercalative and Mior Groove Binding Properties", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19950808), vol. 34, no. 31, pages 9962 - 9976, XP002007935 [XP] 1-12 * column W * | [Y] - HUDSON,H.R. ET AL., "Guanidines with antifungal ( and antibacterial ) activity - a review", INT.PEST CONTROL, LONDON, (198611), pages 148 - 155, XP002007936 [Y] 1-12 * column W * | [X] - ZIMMER,C. ET AL., "Nonintercalating DNA-Binding Ligands: Specifity of the Interaction and their use as tools in Biophysical, Biochemical and Biological Investigations of the Genetic Material", PROG.BIOPHYS.MOLEC.BIOL., OXFORD, (1986), vol. 47, pages 31 - 112, XP002007938 [X] 13-19 * see in particular page 96, table 12 *; column W * | [X] - DEBART,F .ET AL, "Synthesis, DNA Binding, and Biological Evaluation of Synthetic Precursors and Novel Analogues of Netropsin", J.MED.CHEM., WASHINGTON, (1989), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 1074 - 1083, XP002008332 [X] 13-19 * column W * | [Y] - GEIERSTANGER,B.H. ET AL, "Design of a G.C-Specific DNA Minor Groove Binding Peptide", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, (19941018), vol. 266, pages 646 - 650, XP002007937 [Y] 13-19 * column W * | [Y] - GREHN,L. ET AL., "The Preparation and Properties of Partially Protected 4-Amino-1-methylimidazole-2-carboxylic Acids to be used as Intermediates in the Synthesis of Analogues of Distamycin A", ACTA CHEM.SCAND., COPENHAGEN, (199001), vol. 44, pages 67 - 74, XP002007939 [Y] 13-19 * column W * | [YD] - WADE,W.S. ET AL., "Design of Peptides That Bind in the Minor Groove of DNA at 5'-(A,T)G(A,T)C(A,T)-3' Sequences by a Dimeric Side-by-Side Motif", J.AM.CHEM.SOC., WASHINGTON, (1992), vol. 114, pages 8783 - 8794, XP002007940 [YD] 13-19 * column W * |