EP0744757 - D.C. REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMINAGA, Ryuichirou Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | 02 /
IWABUCHI, Noriaki Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | 03 /
ZENKE, Michihiko Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95939392.7 | 07.12.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995JP02508 | Priority number, date | JP19940331520 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33152094 | JP19950081692 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: JP 8169295 | JP19950322270 | 15.11.1995 Original published format: JP 32227095 | [1996/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618198 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744757 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744757 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/24, H01F37/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
H01F37/00 (EP,US);
H01F29/146 (EP,US);
H01F2003/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMDROSSEL | [1996/48] | English: | D.C. REACTOR | [1996/48] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REACTANCE D.C. | [2004/16] |
Former [1996/48] | CIRCUIT DE REACTANCE C.C. | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1996 | Translation filed | 06.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1996 | Search fee paid | 06.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | IE | 07.12.2004 | LU | 07.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
LU | 07.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 07.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59139613 ; | [XA]DE2462520 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1 * page 16, paragraph L - page 17, paragraph L * * page 19, line 3 - line 16; figures 6,9 * [A] 6; | [X]DE3202600 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph L; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841207), vol. 008, no. 268, Database accession no. (E - 283), & JP59139613 A 19840810 (HITACHI KINZOKU KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS4637128B ; | [X]JPS54152957U ; | [Y]JPS5796512 (HITACHI METALS LTD) |