blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0799888

EP0799888 - METHOD OF INHIBITING NON SPECIFIC HYBRIDIZATION IN PRIMER EXTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WAKUNAGA SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-36, Miyahara 4-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-Shi
Osaka 532 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
WAKUNAGA SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-36, Miyahara 4-chome Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-Shi Osaka 532 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMANE, Akio, Wakunaga Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
1624, Shimo-Kotachi Koda-cho
Takata-gun, Hiroshima 739-11 / JP
[2000/06]
Former [1997/41]01 / YAMANE, Akio Wakunaga Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
1624, Shimo-Kotachi Koda-cho Takata-gun
Hiroshima 739-11 / JP
Representative(s)Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth, et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2003/44]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [1997/41]Weisert, Annekäte, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date95939414.911.12.1995
[1997/41]
WO1995JP02535
Priority number, dateJP1994030644109.12.1994         Original published format: JP 30644194
[1997/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9617932
Date:13.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0799888
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0799888
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.1996
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/10, C12Q1/68
[1997/41]
CPC:
C12N15/10 (EP,US); C12Q1/686 (EP,US); C12Q1/6865 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C12Q1/6865, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2525/117 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2525/117 (US,EP);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2525/117 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG VON NICHTSPEZIFISCHER HYBRIDISIERUNG IN PRIMERVERLÄNGERUNGSREAKTIONEN[1997/41]
English:METHOD OF INHIBITING NON SPECIFIC HYBRIDIZATION IN PRIMER EXTENSION[1997/41]
French:PROCEDE D'INHIBITION DE L'HYBRIDATION NON SPECIFIQUE DANS UNE EXTENSION D'AMORCE[1997/41]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1997Translation filed 
03.07.1997National basic fee paid 
03.07.1997Search fee paid 
03.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
03.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
07.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2005Fee for grant paid
16.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH18.05.2005
LI18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
[2006/22]
Former [2006/14]CH18.05.2005
LI18.05.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US5348853  (WANG CHANG-NING J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,14,15 * column 6, paragraph 3 - column 10, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]WO9325706  (BUCHARDT OLE [DK], et al) [A] 1,2,13-15 * page 2, line 3 - line 32 *
International search[AP]JPH07177885  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH)
 [A]  - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), Vol. 20, No. 7, CHOU Q. et al., "Prevention of Pre-PCR Mispriming and Primer Dimerization Improves Low-copy-number Amplification", pages 1717-1724.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.