EP0789669 - BLENDS OF HYDROXAMATED POLYMER EMULSIONS WITH POLYACRYLATE EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWELLYN, Morris, E. 242 Knowlton Street Stratford, CT 06497 / US | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939547.6 | 10.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995US13491 | Priority number, date | US19940334300 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: US 334300 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614271 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789669 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789669 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/06, C08L33/02 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
B01D21/01 (EP,US);
C01F7/0653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN VON EMULSIONEN VON HYDROXAMSÄUREGRUPPEENTHALTENDEN POLYMERENUND POLYACRYLATEN | [1997/34] | English: | BLENDS OF HYDROXAMATED POLYMER EMULSIONS WITH POLYACRYLATE EMULSIONS | [1997/34] | French: | MELANGES D'EMULSIONS DE POLYMERES HYDROXAMATEES AVEC DES EMULSIONS DE POLYACRYLATE | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1999 | BE | 28.07.1999 | CH | 28.07.1999 | LI | 28.07.1999 | NL | 28.07.1999 | SE | 28.07.1999 | LU | 10.10.1999 | DK | 28.10.1999 | PT | 28.10.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
DK | 28.10.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
SE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
CH | 28.07.1999 | ||
LI | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
CH | 04.11.1999 | ||
LI | 04.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 28.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 28.07.1999 | |
BE | 28.07.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4767540 (SPITZER DONALD P [US], et al) [DA] 1-12,30-37 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0514648 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [A] 1-12,30-37 * column W *; | [A]GB2270519 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-45* the whole document *; | [A] - SPITZER D P ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF NEW BAYER PROCESS FLOCCULANTS", LIGHT METALS, NEW ORLEANS, FEB. 17 - 21, 1991, ROOY E, (19910217), no. MEETING 120, pages 167 - 171, XP000366120 [A] 1-12,30-37 | [A] - ROTHENBERG A S ET AL, "NEW REAGENTS FOR ALUMINA PROCESSING", LIGHT METALS, LAS VEGAS, FEB. 27 - MAR. 3, 1989, MINERALS;METALS & MATERIALS SOCIETY, (19890227), no. MEETING 118, pages 91 - 96, XP000138614 [A] 1-12,30-37 |