EP0793514 - MONITORING SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NELLCOR PURITAN BENNETT INCORPORATED 3 Missouri Research Park Drive St. Charles, MO 63304-5685 / US | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYLSWORTH, Alonzo, C. 19359 Ossenfort Court Glencoe, MO 63038 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Gregory, R. 4 Morganfield Court Chesterfield, MO 63005 / US | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95940037.5 | 21.11.1995 | [1997/37] | WO1995US15012 | Priority number, date | US19940344848 | 25.11.1994 Original published format: US 344848 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616688 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793514 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
A61M16/101 (EP,US);
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/0677 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/37] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE ABGABE VON THERAPEUTISCHEM GAS | [1997/37] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC GAS | [1997/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE GAZ THERAPEUTIQUE | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 18.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9211054 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 6; figures 1-4,19,22,23 * * page 30, line 15 - page 31, line 5 *; | [X]US4823788 (SMITH RICHARD F M [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9103979 (WESTENSKOW DWAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * page 9, line 17 - page 12, line 20; figure 1; table 1 * | International search | [A]US4462398 (DURKAN GERALD [US], et al); | [A]US4677975 (EDGAR BRIAN W [NZ], et al); | [A]US4681099 (SATO TORU [JP], et al); | [A]US4686975 (NAIMON ERROL J [US], et al); | [A]WO9010470 (DRACO AB [SE]) |