EP0800599 - RAILWAY TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gmundner Fertigteile Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG. Kuferzeile 30-32 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Bernhard Kuferzeile 30 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 95940079.7 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995AT00252 | Priority number, date | AT19940002433 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: AT 243394 | [1998/21] |
Former [1997/42] | AT19490024339 | 30.12.1994 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621063 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800599 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800599 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/60, E01B3/38 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
E01B3/38 (EP,FI,US);
E01B9/60 (EP,FI,US);
E01B2204/11 (EP,US);
E01B2204/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Extension states | SI | 05.07.1997 | Title | German: | GLEIS | [1997/42] | English: | RAILWAY TRACK | [1997/42] | French: | VOIE FERREE | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 20.05.1998 | NL | 20.05.1998 | DK | 20.08.1998 | IE | 11.12.1998 | LU | 22.12.1998 | BE | 31.12.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 20.05.1998 | |
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
DK | 20.08.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GR | 20.05.1998 | |
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 20.05.1998 | |
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 20.05.1998 | |
IE | 20.05.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | IE | 20.05.1998 | |
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | IE | 20.05.1998 | |
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 20.05.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1587691 (WHITTINGHAM RICHARD A) [A] 15 * page 1, line 57 - line 102; figure 2 *; | [A]CH389663 (METEOOR NV BETONFABRIEK [NL]) [A] 5 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3118540 (HOETZEL BETON GMBH [DE]) [A] 30* page 4, line 6 - line 31; figure . *; | [A]BE903871 (DYNAMIT DU BATIMENT EN ABREGE, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0620316 (WUERZBURGER STRASSENBAHN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 18; figure 2 * |