EP0793834 - FINGER RING WITH INFORMATION STORAGE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rein, Claus Maulbeerallee 5 14469 Potsdam / DE | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/37] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig, Lützowplatz 11-13 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95940118.3 | 21.11.1995 | [1997/37] | WO1995DE01700 | Priority number, date | DE19944443253 | 25.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4443253 | [1997/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617319 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793834 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/04, G06K19/077, E05B49/00 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/04 (EP,US);
G06K19/07762 (EP,US);
A44C9/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | FINGERRING MIT INFORMATIONSSPEICHEREINHEIT | [1997/37] | English: | FINGER RING WITH INFORMATION STORAGE UNIT | [1997/37] | French: | BAGUE COMPRENANT UNE MEMOIRE DE DONNEES | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/42] | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 30.11.2005 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2007 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3806874 (EHRAT K) [X] 1,3,8-10 * column 12, line 64 - column 13, line 49; figures 9,11 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [DYA]DE2557637 (KREFT HANS DIEDRICH) [DY] 4,6 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,2; | [YA]EP0034230 (LEMELSON JEROME H) [Y] 7 [A] 1,2; | [A]DE3836801 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3935364 (ANGEWANDTE DIGITAL ELEKTRONIK) [A] 10 * figure 1 *; | [PX]DE9320743U (REIN CLAUS DR [DE]) [PX] 1,3,4,6-10* the whole document * |