EP0742851 - SPINNING BEAM FOR SPINNING A PLURALITY OF SYNTHETIC THREADS AND SPINNING DEVICE COMPRISING A SPINNING BEAM OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B a r m a g AG Sitz Remscheid, Leverkuser Strasse 65 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIPPERS, Heinz Semmelweisstrasse 14 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFER, Klaus Hackenberg 79 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | [1996/47] | Application number, filing date | 95940123.3 | 01.12.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995DE01705 | Priority number, date | DE19944442946 | 02.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4442946 | DE19944445837 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4445837 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617116 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742851 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742851 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/08, D01D1/06, D01D5/088 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
D01D4/06 (EP,US);
D01D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
D01D1/06 (EP,US);
D01D5/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/47] | Title | German: | SPINNBALKEN ZUM SPINNEN EINER MEHRZAHL VON SYNTHETISCHEN FÄDEN UND SPINNANLAGE MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN SPINNBALKEN | [1996/47] | English: | SPINNING BEAM FOR SPINNING A PLURALITY OF SYNTHETIC THREADS AND SPINNING DEVICE COMPRISING A SPINNING BEAM OF THIS TYPE | [1996/47] | French: | COLLECTEUR-REPARTITEUR PERMETTANT DE FILER UNE PLURALITE DE FILS SYNTHETIQUES ET INSTALLATIONS DE FILAGE POURVUES DE CE TYPE DE COLLECTEUR-REPARTITEUR | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE3343714 (SNAM PROGETTI [IT]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-7; | [Y]DE2248757 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0285736 (FILTECO SPA [IT]); | [A]DE2644996 (ALLIED CHEM); | [D]US3999910 (PENDLEBURY DAVID, et al) |