EP0799411 - FUSED STRAIN GAUGE AND MONITORED PIPE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD Bradford West Yorkshire, BD7 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD Bradford, West Yorkshire, BD7 1DP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAY, Andrew, John University of Bradford Bradford West Yorkshire BD7 1DP / GB | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY, West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 95940346.0 | 11.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995GB02885 | Priority number, date | GB19940025770 | 20.12.1994 Original published format: GB 9425770 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619718 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799411 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799411 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22, G01M3/28, F16L47/02, F17D5/06 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
G01M5/0041 (EP);
B29C65/342 (EP);
B29C66/1222 (EP);
B29C66/1224 (EP);
B29C66/5221 (EP);
B29C66/52292 (EP);
B29C66/92211 (EP);
F16L47/03 (EP);
G01L1/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | EINGESCHMOLZENER DEHNUNGSMESSSTREIFEN UND ÜBERWACHTES LEITUNGSSYSTEM | [1997/41] | English: | FUSED STRAIN GAUGE AND MONITORED PIPE SYSTEM | [1997/41] | French: | JAUGE DE CONTRAINTE FONDUE ET SYSTEME DE CONDUITES SURVEILLE | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2000 | BE | 19.07.2000 | CH | 19.07.2000 | ES | 19.07.2000 | FR | 19.07.2000 | GR | 19.07.2000 | IT | 19.07.2000 | LI | 19.07.2000 | NL | 19.07.2000 | DK | 19.10.2000 | PT | 19.10.2000 | SE | 19.10.2000 | DE | 20.10.2000 | IE | 11.12.2000 | LU | 11.12.2000 | MC | 31.12.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
FR | 19.07.2000 | ||
GR | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
NL | 19.07.2000 | ||
DK | 19.10.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
LU | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
FR | 19.07.2000 | ||
GR | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
NL | 19.07.2000 | ||
DK | 19.10.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
GR | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
NL | 19.07.2000 | ||
DK | 19.10.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
NL | 19.07.2000 | ||
DK | 19.10.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
NL | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
ES | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
DE | 20.10.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
CH | 19.07.2000 | ||
LI | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
SE | 19.10.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
FR | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
BE | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 19.07.2000 | |
PT | 19.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 19.07.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2137026 (FUSION PLASTICS LTD) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0185650 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1,12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4712182 (WAKAMORI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 16,19 * column 1, line 23 - line 40 * * column 2, line 59 - line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4217583 (INSPECTA PIPE GES FUER UMWELTS [DE]) [A] 16,19 * column 2, line 15 - line 21 ** column 5, line 8 - line 22; figure 1 * |