EP0865577 - TURBOMACHINERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | For all designated states Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON Torrington Place London WC1E 7JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ebara Research Co., Ltd. 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | |||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON Torrington Place London WC1E 7JE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Akira Ebara Reseach Co., Ltd., 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | 02 /
ZANGENEH, Mehrdad 72 Langdon Park Road London N6 5PY / GB | 03 /
HARADA, Hideomi Ebara Research Co., Ltd., 2-1, Honfujisawa 4-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/39] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95940361.9 | 07.12.1995 | [1998/39] | WO1995GB02904 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721035 | Date: | 12.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865577 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865577 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/28 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
F04D29/681 (EP);
F04D29/2205 (EP);
F04D29/284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINE UND IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1998/39] | English: | TURBOMACHINERY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1998/39] | French: | TURBOMACHINES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2224083 (ROLLS-ROYCE); | [A]WO8501992 (SUNDSTRAND); | [A]DE333336 (MÖSSNER); | [A]US3481531 (MAC ARTHUR); | [A]FR2550585 (FOUEILLASSAR) | [AD] - ZHONGOI, W, "An Experimental Investigation into the Reasons of Reducing Secondary Flow Losses by Using Leaned Blades in Rectangular Turbine Cascades with Incidence Angle", THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, (1988), pages 1 - 7, XP000563980 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 * (ASME paper 88-GT-4). * | [AD] - BORGES, J.E., "A Three-Dimensional Inverse Method for Turbomachinery:Part 1-Theory", THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, (1990), vol. 112, pages 346 - 354, XP000563997 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 | [AD] - BORGES, J.E., "A proposed through-flow inverse method for the design of mixed-flow pumps", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR NUMERICAL METHODS IN FLUIDS, CHICHESTER, (19931230), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1019 - 1144, XP000563982 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/fld.1650171206 | [AD] - YANG, Y. L., "Aerodynamic Design of Turbomachinery Blading in Three-Dimensional Flow: An Application to Radial Inflow Turbines.", THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, (199307), vol. 115, pages 602 - 613, XP000564765 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 * (ASME Paper 92-GT 74) * | [AD] - ZANGENEH, M., "A Compressible Three-Dimensional Design Method for Radial and Mixed Flow Turbomachinery Blades", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NUMERICAL METHODS IN FLUIDS, CHICHESTER, (1991), vol. 13, pages 599 - 624, XP000563989 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/fld.1650130505 | [AD] - DANG, T. Q., "A Fully Three-Dimensional Inverse Method for Turbomachinery Blading in Transonic Flows", THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OT MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, (1993), vol. 115, pages 354 - 361, XP000563986 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 | [AD] - SMITH, L. H., "Sweep and Dihedral Effects in Axial-Flow Turbomachinery", THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, (196309), vol. 85, no. 3, pages 401 - 416, XP000560640 [AD] 1,6,9-12,15,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.3656623 |