EP0871349 - DISCHARGE LAMP OPERATING ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Koseijapan 14-3, Isohama-machi 1-chome, Kanda-machi, Miyako-gun Fukuoka-ken 800-03 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Kabushuki Kaisha Koseijapan 14-3, Isohama-machi 1-chome, Kanda-machi, Miyako-gun Fukuoka-ken 800-03 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong, Ki 1038, Jae Song-2Dong Hae un Dae-gu Busan, 612-050 / KR | [1998/52] |
Former [1998/42] | 01 /
KIM, Jong, Ki 1038, Jae Song-2 dong, Hae un Dae-gu Busan 612-050 / KR | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95940474.0 | 19.12.1995 | [1998/42] | WO1995JP02608 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9723119 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871349 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871349 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/24, H05B41/292 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H05B41/2988 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | H05B41/24, H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | DE [1998/42] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB VON ENTLADUNGSLAMPEN | [1998/42] | English: | DISCHARGE LAMP OPERATING ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [1998/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE DE COMMANDE DE LAMPE A DECHARGE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1998 | Translation filed | 16.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 16.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 25.08.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS61203597 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JPH01248969 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPH0359998 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH053093 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH0515395U ; | [X]JPH05508966 ; | [Y]JPH05326177 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH0654535 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPH0696887 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [E]JPH07335387 (KOOSEI JAPAN KK, et al) |