EP0799163 - METHOD FOR FIBERIZING MINERAL MATERIAL WITH ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo Ohio 43659 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AULT, Patrick, L. 2795 Ritchey Road Newark, OH 43055 / US | 02 /
PELLEGRIN, Michael, T. 505 Marion Manor Woods Newark, OH 43055 / US | 03 /
LOFTUS, James, E. 1239 Normandy Drive Newark, OH 43055 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95940811.3 | 27.11.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US15239 | Priority number, date | US19940363471 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: US 363471 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620140 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799163 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799163 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/04, C03C25/10 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C03B37/045 (EP,US);
C03B37/04 (KR);
E04B2001/7687 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/41] | C03B37/04, C03C25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZUFASERN EINES MINERALEN MATERIALS MIT EINEM ORGANISCHEN MATERIAL | [1997/41] | English: | METHOD FOR FIBERIZING MINERAL MATERIAL WITH ORGANIC MATERIAL | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEFIBRAGE DE MATIERE MINERALE AVEC DE LA MATIERE ORGANIQUE | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4277436 (SHAH HASHMUK G, et al) [A] 1,5,9,14* column W *; | [A]US4832723 (SHISLER DONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9,14 * column W *; | [A]US5232638 (THIESSEN LEO K [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9,14 * column W *; | [PX]WO9500454 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [PX] 1,5,9,14 * the whole document * |