EP0800449 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING REINFORCING INSERTS FOR MATERIAL COMPOSITES, IN PARTICULAR FOR GRINDING OR CUTTING-OFF WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eichenberger, Reinhard c/o Frau Edith Del Bon, Eggenacherstrasse 52 4663 Aarburg / CH | [1998/02] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Eichenberger, Reinhard Sonnhaldenstrasse 57 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/42] | Application number, filing date | 95940932.7 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995CH00305 | Priority number, date | CH19950000003 | 03.01.1995 Original published format: CH 395 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620824 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800449 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800449 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/38, B24D18/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B29C70/16 (EP);
B24D18/0081 (EP);
B24D3/34 (EP);
B29C70/38 (EP);
B29C70/541 (EP);
B29C70/521 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI [1997/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERSTÄRKUNGSEINLAGEN FÜR WERKSTOFFVERBUNDE, INSBESONDERE SCHLEIF- ODER TRENNSCHEIBEN | [1997/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING REINFORCING INSERTS FOR MATERIAL COMPOSITES, IN PARTICULAR FOR GRINDING OR CUTTING-OFF WHEELS | [1997/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'INSERTS DE RENFORCEMENT POUR DES COMPOSITES DE MATERIAUX, EN PARTICULIER POUR MEULES D'AFFUTAGE OU DE TRONCONNAGE | [1999/27] |
Former [1997/42] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'INSERTS DE RENFORCEMENT POUR DES COMPOSITES DE MATERIAUX, EN PARTICULIER POUR MEULES D'AFFUTAGE OU DE TRON ONNAGE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Request for further processing for: | 18.09.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 29.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3566733 (MCCLEAN WILLIAM G) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 37; figure 11; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2250628 (M & M INTERNATIONAL PLASTICS [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3003666 (POTT RICHARD) [X] 1-20 * page 22, line 21 - line 24 *; | [A]EP0062991 (GKN TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3226290 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1-20 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [X]WO8400351 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * figure 8A; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0154321 (CINCINNATI MILACRON INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 11; figures 7A-7D *; | [A]WO9007428 (ZSOLNAY ANDREW M [US]) [A] 3 * page 34, line 3 - line 17; figure 12 *; | [A]US4943338 (WISBEY JERRY D [US], et al) [A] 19 * column 7, line 31 - line 57; figure 5B *; | [A]EP0557158 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1* column 5, line 29 - line 36; figure 10 *; | [A]FR2692520 (MEDITERRANEE CONST INDLE [FR]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |