blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0793439

EP0793439 - A METHOD FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/37]A METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH
[1999/19]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JohnsonDiversey, Inc.
8310 16th Street Sturtevant
Wisconsin 53177-0902 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
JohnsonDiversey, Inc.
8310 16th Street
Sturtevant, Wisconsin 53177-0902 / US
Former [1997/37]For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / LANSBERGEN, Adrianus, Joost
Fazantenkamp 704
NL-3607 DR Maarssen / NL
02 / UHLHORN, Robert, Jan
Marius Bauerstraat 14
NL-3443 HL Woerden / NL
03 / NICHOLSON, John, Richard
88 Sherwood Drive
Ramsey, NJ 07446 / US
04 / RAIBLE, Duane, Unilever Research US Inc.
45 River Road
Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US
[1997/37]
Representative(s)Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al
RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
Former [2002/42]Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Former [1997/37]Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al
Unilever N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date95940999.621.11.1995
[1997/37]
WO1995EP04606
Priority number, dateGB1994002323424.11.1994         Original published format: GB 9423234
[1997/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9615710
Date:30.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0793439
Date:10.09.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0793439
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.1996
ClassificationIPC:A47L15/44, C11D3/00
[1997/37]
CPC:
A47L15/44 (EP); C11D3/386 (EP); C11D2111/14 (EP);
C11D2111/44 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM GESCHIRRWASCHEN OHNE VERWENDUNG VON BLEICHMITTELN[1999/19]
English:A METHOD FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH[1999/19]
French:PROCEDE DE LAVAGE INDUSTRIEL DE VAISSELLE SANS AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT[1999/19]
Former [1997/37]VERFAHREN UND SPÜLMITTEL ZUM GESCHIRRWASCHEN OHNE VERWENDUNG VON BLEICHMITTELN
Former [1997/37]A METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR WAREWASHING WITHOUT BLEACH
Former [1997/37]PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION DESTINES AU LAVAGE INDUSTRIEL DE VAISSELLE SANS AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT
Entry into regional phase02.04.1997National basic fee paid 
02.04.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/37]
16.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1999Fee for grant paid
04.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.2000  06.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  25.10.2000  09.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.)
Mühlenhagen 85
D-20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keussen, Christof
Glawe Delfs Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/16]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2000  06.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  25.10.2000  09.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.)
Mühlenhagen 85
D-20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keussen, Christof, Dr.
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2003/33]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2000  06.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
 02  25.10.2000  09.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.)
Mühlenhagen 85
D-20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keussen, Christof, Dr.
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/51]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2000  06.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.10.2000  09.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Chemische Fabrik Dr. Weigert (GmbH & Co.)
Mühlenhagen 85
D-20539 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keussen, Christof, Dr.
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/50]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2000  06.11.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
01.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.09.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2003Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.08.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/32]
Appeal following opposition28.01.2004Appeal received No.  T0157/04
05.04.2004Statement of grounds filed
09.08.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
09.08.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.08.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.199703   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1997
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1296839  (NOVO TERAPEUTISK LABORATORIUM A/D) [A] 1,7;
 [A]GB2189520  (UNILEVER PLC)[A] 1;
 [X]DE4219620  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9427488  (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - line 13; claims 1,3,4 *
ExaminationEP0282214
 DE4324106
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.