EP0796211 - VARIABLE VOLUME SEALED CONTAINER FOR STORING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundrich, Lorena 18, rue Paul-Schutzenberger 68200 Mulhouse / FR | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/39] | Nithardt, Roland CABINET NITHARDT ET ASSOCIES 24 rue de l'Est - B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95941762.7 | 05.12.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995FR01597 | Priority number, date | FR19940015148 | 13.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415148 | [1997/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618559 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796211 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796211 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/34, B65D90/38 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
B65D88/34 (EP);
B65D90/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/39] | Title | German: | DICHTER BEHÄLTER MIT VARIABLEM VOLUMEN FÜR DIE LAGERUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1997/39] | English: | VARIABLE VOLUME SEALED CONTAINER FOR STORING LIQUIDS | [1997/39] | French: | RESERVOIR ETANCHE A VOLUME VARIABLE POUR LE STOCKAGE D'UN LIQUIDE | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1636539 (WIGGINS JOHN H) [A] 1,6,9 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]US1823256 (CLARK EDWIN M) [DA] 1,4,6,9 * column W *; | [Y]FR802831 (ANCIENS ETS BARBIER) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1541092 (GIOVANOLA FRERES SA) [A] 1,5,7,9* the whole document *; | [DYA]FR2385612 (NIPPON SEKIYU HANBAI KK [JP], et al) [DY] 1 * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 17; figure 6 * [A] 3-5,7,8,10 |