EP0791139 - HETEROGENEOUS ENERGY ACCUMULATION OR DISSIPATION STRUCTURE, METHODS FOR USING SUCH STRUCTURE AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D L D INTERNATIONAL 135, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states Eroshenko, Valentin 135, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1998/02] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states D L D INTERNATIONAL 135, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EROSHENKO, Valentin 135, boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher 23, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95941774.2 | 06.12.1995 | [1997/35] | WO1995FR01609 | Priority number, date | FR19940014856 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9414856 | [1997/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618040 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791139 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0791139 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/04, F16F9/00, F16F5/00, F15B21/06 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
F28D20/00 (EP,US);
F15B21/06 (EP,US);
F16F5/00 (EP,US);
F16F9/003 (EP,US);
F28D20/023 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/35] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION FÜR HETEROGENE ENERGIEAKKUMULATION ODER ABLEITUNG, METHODE ZU DERENVERWENDUNG UND DAZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [1997/35] | English: | HETEROGENEOUS ENERGY ACCUMULATION OR DISSIPATION STRUCTURE, METHODS FOR USING SUCH STRUCTURE AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUS | [1997/35] | French: | STRUCTURE HETEROGENE D'ACCUMULATION OU DE DISSIPATION D'ENERGIE, PROCEDES D'UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE STRUCTURE ET APPAREILS ASSOCIES | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 22.06.2000 | [2003/45] | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1333870 ; | [X]SU943444 ; | [A]FR1553302 (LICENTIA) [A] 5* page 1, paragraph 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0057130 (SOCAPEX [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 14, Database accession no. 88-097314, & SU1333870 A 19870830 (KIEV POLY) [X] 1,4,6-10,13-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 21, Database accession no. 83-H0355K, & SU943444 A 19820715 (EROSHENKO) [X] 1,2,9,10,13 * abstract * |