19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
22.02.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
26.01.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
11.02.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
21.01.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
21.01.2000 |
Change - name/address |
published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
17.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.09.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.08.1998 |
First examination report |
|
19.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.08.1998 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
13.08.1998 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
15.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
18.10.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
22.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|