EP0745203 - METHOD AND PREFABRICATED PARTS FOR PRODUCING PIPE BRANCH PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reich KG, Regel- und Sicherheitstechnik Ahornweg 37 35713 Eschenburg / DE | [2000/10] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states Reich KG, Regel- und Sicherheitstechnik Ahornweg 37 35713 Eschenburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bender, Helmuth Bombergstrasse 29 35713 Eschenburg-Wissenbach / DE | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Alfons J., et al ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Hofstetter, Alfons J., Dr.rer.nat., et al Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/49] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942167.8 | 15.12.1995 | [1996/49] | WO1995EP04973 | Priority number, date | DE19944445005 | 16.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4445005 | [1996/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618843 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745203 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745203 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/06, F16L47/00, F16L41/16 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
F16L47/345 (EP,US);
F16L41/06 (EP,US);
F16L41/12 (EP,US);
F16L41/16 (EP,US);
Y10T137/034 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6123 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORGEFERTIGTE TEILE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ROHRABZWEIGUNGEN | [1996/49] | English: | METHOD AND PREFABRICATED PARTS FOR PRODUCING PIPE BRANCH PIECES | [1996/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET PIECES PREFABRIQUEES POUR LA REALISATION DE DERIVATIONS SUR DES TUYAUTERIES | [1996/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 11.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 29.03.2000 | DK | 29.06.2000 | AT | 15.12.2000 | GB | 15.12.2000 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/09] | SE | 29.03.2000 | |
AT | 15.12.2000 | ||
GB | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 29.03.2000 | |
GB | 15.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/15] | GB | 15.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2512009 (BOBER LOUIS E) [Y] 1-3,7 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US4100929 (HARRISON GEORGE W) [Y] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0093328 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5152310 (O'BRYON PHILIP J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |