EP0758175 - COMMUNICATION SWITCHING SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION SWITCHING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | ||
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Kimio 22-20, Chuo 4-chome Warabi-shi Saitama 335 / JP | 02 /
SASADA, Koji 3B Yamamura-Building 9-12, Honcho 1-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Akitoshi 1-1-1 Tokorozawa Tomomihara-Syataku 3-2971-3, Mihara-cho Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359 / JP | 04 /
SUGIYAMA, Kazuo 43-162, Imayakamimachi Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277 / JP | 05 /
MAEBARA, Akihiro A-312 Tomioka-daiichi-ryo 2-12, Sugita 9-chome Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235 / JP | 06 /
OKAJIMA, Ichiro 18-3-305, Mori 6-chome Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 235 / JP | 07 /
UCHIDA, Noriko 110-703, Negishi-cho 2-chome Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231 / JP | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942308.8 | 28.12.1995 | [1997/07] | WO1995JP02755 | Priority number, date | JP19950000395 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: JP 39595 | JP19950000396 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: JP 39695 | [1997/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621308 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758175 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758175 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/00 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04L12/6402 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/4281 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6456 (EP,US);
H04L2012/6486 (EP,US);
H04M2203/156 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M3/42365 (EP,US);
H04M3/487 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1997/07] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERMITTUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [1997/07] | English: | COMMUNICATION SWITCHING SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION SWITCHING METHOD | [1997/07] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMUTATION DE COMMUNICATION | [1997/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1996 | Translation filed | 24.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0399520 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 18 - column 28 * * column 7, line 13 - line 33 * * column 8, line 11 - line 18 * * column 12, line 3 - line 18 * * column 13, line 46 - line 52 * * column 20, line 18 - line 40 * * column 21, line 41 - line 47 * * column 23, line 46 - line 57 ** column 25, line 47 - column 26, line 8 *; | [A]EP0592963 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 24 * * column 7, line 3 - line 24 *; | [A]JPH06303315 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-20; | [AP]US5459775 (ISONO OSAMU [JP], et al) [AP] 1-20 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 49 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 13 * | International search | [A]JPH0637929 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) |