EP0793589 - ANTI-LOCK BRAKE SYSTEM WITH GEAR PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Tennessee, Inc. 402 East Haven Street Eaton Rapids, MI 48827 / US | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTELL, Robert, J. 12576 Spruce Lane Perry, MI 48872 / US | 02 /
KERN, Calvin, V. 419 Moores River Drive Lansing, MI 48910 / US | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Wilhelm-Greilstrasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 95942449.0 | 21.11.1995 | [1997/37] | WO1995US15147 | Priority number, date | US19940343772 | 22.11.1994 Original published format: US 343772 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615925 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793589 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B60T8/4291 (EP,US);
B60T8/32 (KR);
B60T8/4022 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
B60T8/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/37] | Title | German: | ANTIBLOCKIER-BREMSSYSTEM MIT ZAHNRADPUMPE | [1997/37] | English: | ANTI-LOCK BRAKE SYSTEM WITH GEAR PUMP | [1997/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ANTIBLOCAGE A POMPES A ENGRENAGES | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 26.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 20.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/36] | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0566344 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 1 * * column 3, line 26 - line 33 * * column 4, line 5 - line 23; figure 1; claim 5 *; | [Y]US5048899 (SCHMITT MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 23 - line 32 * * column 4, line 54 - line 65 * * column 5, line 43 - line 57; figures 2,3; claim 2 *; | [A]DE4107626 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS61202965 ; | [A]DE4218402 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US4636011 (BLOMBERG FOLKE I [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 14, line 4 - line 6 * * column 14, line 49 - line 55; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4166657 (BLOMBERG FOLKE I [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 13 - line 16; figures 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871031), vol. 11, no. 34, Database accession no. (M - 558), & JP61202965 A 00000000 (NIPPON DENSO CO.) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5183317 (GUTZEIT REINHARD [DE]); | [Y]US4921313 (ARIKAWA TETSURO [JP]); | [Y]US5040854 (ARIKAWA TETSURO [JP]); | [Y]JPH05147524 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]US4477125 (BELART JUAN [DE], et al); | [Y]US5013096 (OCVIRK NORBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US4840436 (BURGDORF JOCHEN [DE], et al) |