EP0794735 - ALTERNATIVE CURRENT PATHWAYS FOR BIPOLAR SURGICAL CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL SCIENTIFIC, INC. 125 John Hancock Road Taunton, MA 02780 / US | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242-2839 / US | [1997/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARDELLA, Paul, C. 12 Cromesett Point Wareham, MA 02571 / US | 02 /
YATES, David, C. 7534 Galway Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
KUHNS, Jesse, J. 683 Riddle Road Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US | 04 /
NUCHOLS, Richard, P. 1560 Georgetown Road Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 05 /
MADDEN, Martin 6631 Saddlebrook Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 06 /
MERSCH, Steven, H. 7347 Weaver Road Germantown, OH 45327 / US | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95942496.1 | 29.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995US15447 | Priority number, date | US19940348038 | 01.12.1994 Original published format: US 348038 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616605 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794735 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794735 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B18/1447 (EP,US);
A61B17/32 (EP,US);
A61B18/1402 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US);
G01N30/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/33] | A61B17/39 | ||
Former IPC [1997/38] | A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/38] | Title | German: | ALTERNATIVE STROMWEGE FÜR EIN BIPOLARES CHIRURGISCHES SCHNEIDWERKZEUG | [2003/47] | English: | ALTERNATIVE CURRENT PATHWAYS FOR BIPOLAR SURGICAL CUTTING TOOL | [1997/38] | French: | VOIES ALTERNATIVES DE COURANT POUR UN INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL COUPANT BIPOLAIRE | [2003/47] |
Former [1997/38] | ALTERNATIVE STROMWEGE FÜR EIN BIPOLARES CHIRURGISCHES SCHNEIDWEKZEUG | ||
Former [1997/38] | VOIES DE COURANT ALTERNATIF POUR UN INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL COUPANT BIPOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2004 | BE | 21.07.2004 | CH | 21.07.2004 | LI | 21.07.2004 | NL | 21.07.2004 | DK | 21.10.2004 | GR | 21.10.2004 | SE | 21.10.2004 | ES | 01.11.2004 | IE | 29.11.2004 | LU | 29.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | PT | 21.12.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
IE | 29.11.2004 | ||
LU | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
IE | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
IE | 29.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 21.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5207691 (NARDELLA PAUL C [US]); | [XP]US5389098 (TSURUTA MINORU [JP], et al); | [XP]US5403312 (YATES DAVID C [US], et al) | Examination | WO9308754 | by applicant | US4651734 | US5104025 |