EP0799330 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VARYING THE FLUX OF A MOLECULAR BEAM PRODUCED BY A MOLECULAR BEAM EPITAXY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Century City Los Angeles, California 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Century City Los Angeles California 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Myung, B. 101 River Heights Drive Smithtown, NY 11787 / US | 02 /
VANHATALO, Jari 1001 Broughton Drive Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942600.8 | 11.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US15971 | Priority number, date | US19940361961 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 361961 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619597 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799330 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/00, C30B23/06 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
C30B23/066 (EP,US);
Y10S117/90 (EP,US);
Y10T117/10 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1016 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/41] | C30B25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | EIN VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSTELLEN DES MOLEKULARSTRAHLS, DER DURCH EINE MOLEKULARSTRAHL-EPITAXIEZELLE ERZEUGT WIRD | [1997/41] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VARYING THE FLUX OF A MOLECULAR BEAM PRODUCED BY A MOLECULAR BEAM EPITAXY CELL | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MODIFICATION DU FLUX D'UN FAISCEAU MOLECULAIRE PRODUIT PAR UNE CELLULE D'EPITAXIE DE FAISCEAU MOLECULAIRE | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/51] | 25.07.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62132314 ; | [A]FR2703077 (HARMAND JEAN CHRISTOPHE [FR]); | [A]JPS60204694 ; | [A]JPH04356915 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871119), vol. 11, no. 355, Database accession no. (E - 558), & JP62132314 A 19870615 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860315), vol. 10, no. 67, Database accession no. (C - 333)<2124>, & JP60204694 A 19851016 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930507), vol. 17, no. 223, Database accession no. (E - 1359), & JP04356915 A 19921210 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - THORPE ET AL., "improved thickness uniformity in molecular beam epitaxial growth...", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A., NEW YORK US, (199112), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 3175 - 3177, XP000335273 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.577141 | International search | [Y]US4181544 (CHO ALFRED Y [US]); | [YP]US5415128 (KAO YUNG-CHUNG [US], et al); | [A]US4622083 (SHIH HUNG-DAH [US]); | [A]US3839084 (CHO A, et al) |