EP0800702 - PROCESS AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR A COMMUTATION AND TURNING-OFF SYSTEM OF A QUICK MAKE-AND-BREAK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elpro BahnstromAnlagen GmbH Marzahner Strasse 34 13053 Berlin / DE | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Elpro Verkehrstechnik GmbH Marzahner Strasse 34 13053 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states ELPRO AG BERLIN - INDUSTRIEELEKTRONIK UND ANLAGENBAU Herzbergstrasse 87-99 D-10365 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERLACH, Horst Gensler Strasse 44 D-13055 Berlin / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Heinz-Dietrich Elpro AG Berlin Marzahnerstrasse 34 13053 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Hoffmann, Heinz-Dietrich Elpro AG Berlin, Marzahnerstrasse 34 13053 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Hoffmann, Heinz-Dietrich Elpro AG Berlin, Rhinstrasse 100 12681 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942718.8 | 20.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995EP05070 | Priority number, date | DE19944447439 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4447439 | DE19944447440 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4447440 | DE19944447441 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4447441 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620489 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800702 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800702 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/54, H01H33/59 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H01H9/542 (EP);
H01H33/596 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1997/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE KOMMUTIERUNGS- UND LÖSCHEINRICHTUNG EINES SCHNELLUNTERBRECHERS | [1997/42] | English: | PROCESS AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR A COMMUTATION AND TURNING-OFF SYSTEM OF A QUICK MAKE-AND-BREAK | [1997/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUITERIE POUR SYSTEME DE COMMUTATION ET DE BLOCAGE D'UN INTERRUPTEUR A GRANDE VITESSE | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1206696 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 83 - line 99; figure . *; | [A]US4723187 (HOWELL EDWARD K [US]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [D]DE3735009 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0272349 (ACEC [BE]) [A] 1 * column A * |