EP0739222 - QUICK-CONNECT COUPLING FOR A MEDICATION INFUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiniMed Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states MiniMed Inc. 12744 San Fernando Road Sylmar, California 91342 / US | ||
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Minimed Inc. 12744 San Fernando Road Sylmar, California 91342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNDERBURK, Jeffery, V. 17245 Lahey Street Granada Hills, CA 91344 / US | 02 /
McINTYRE, Deborah, C. 368 N. Medea Creek Lane Agoura Hills, CA 91301 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/44] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Patentanwälte Ruschke, Lewald, Hartmann & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942853.3 | 12.10.1995 | [1996/44] | WO1995US14632 | Priority number, date | US19940328782 | 28.10.1994 Original published format: US 328782 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614096 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0739222 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0739222 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/10, F16L37/252 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A61M39/14 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1581 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1072 (EP,US);
Y10S604/905 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | A61M39/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | SCHNELLKUPPLUNG FÜR EIN MEDIKAMENTENINFUSIONSSYSTEM | [1996/44] | English: | QUICK-CONNECT COUPLING FOR A MEDICATION INFUSION SYSTEM | [1996/44] | French: | RACCORD RAPIDE POUR ENSEMBLE DE PERFUSION DE MEDICAMENTS | [1996/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 04.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 05.09.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9116938 (RYAN MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 8-11,14,16 * page 7, line 12 - page 9, line 26 * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 1-4,6,17; | [Y]US4758023 (VERMILLION DON W [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,17 * column 1, line 6 - line 12 * * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 12 * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 5 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4082327 (STING DONALD W, et al) [A] 1,15,17 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4256106 (SHOOR BERNARD A) [A] 4,12 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 54 * * figures 1A,3 * | International search | [A]US5176662 (BARTHOLOMEW GERALD [US], et al); | [A]US4685903 (CABLE VAUGHN P [US], et al); | [A]US5257980 (VAN ANTWERP WILLIAM P [US], et al) |