EP0797664 - USE OF A HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-11 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/40] | HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-11 RECEPTOR | ||
[2005/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetics Institute, LLC 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2002/26] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC. 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOBIN, James F. 78 Clearwater Road Newton, MA 02162 / US | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95942913.5 | 27.11.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995US15400 | Priority number, date | US19940362304 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 362304 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619574 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797664 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797664 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/715, A61K38/17, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, G01N33/68 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07K14/715 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES MENSCHLICHEN INTERLEUKIN-11 REZEPTORS | [2005/12] | English: | USE OF A HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-11 RECEPTOR | [2005/12] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN RECEPTEUR DE L'INTERLEUKINE-11 HUMAINE | [2005/12] |
Former [1997/40] | MENSCHLICHES INTERLEUKIN-11 REZEPTOR | ||
Former [1997/40] | HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-11 RECEPTOR | ||
Former [1997/40] | RECEPTEUR DE L'INTERLEUKINE-11 HUMAINE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04024209.1 / EP1566440 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 30.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2006 | BE | 18.10.2006 | IE | 27.11.2006 | LU | 27.11.2006 | ES | 28.11.2006 | SE | 28.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | FR | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | GB | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | DK | 31.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | DE | 01.06.2007 | NL | 01.06.2007 | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
LU | 27.11.2006 | ||
ES | 28.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
DE | 01.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
ES | 28.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
DE | 01.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
DE | 01.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
DE | 01.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/06] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
SE | 28.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
DE | 01.06.2007 | ||
NL | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
BE | 18.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 18.10.2006 | |
PT | 19.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X] - H. NEUHAUS ET AL, "Etl2, a novel putative type-I cytokine receptor expressed during mouse embryogenesis at high levels in skin and cells with skeletogenic potential", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 166, pages 531 - 542, XP002000295 [X] 1,4-9,29,30 *see the whole document especially figure 3 page 535 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1994.1335 | [X] - D.J. HILTON ET AL, "Cloning of a murine IL-11 receptor alpha-chain ; requirement for gp130 for high affinity binding and signal transduction", EMBO JOURNAL, EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (19941017), vol. 13, no. 20, pages 4765 - 4775, XP002000296 [X] 1,4-9,29,30 * page 4766, column R, line 9 - line 37 * * page 4769, column R, line 17 - line 20 * * figure 1 * | [PX] - M. CHEREL ET AL, "Molecular cloning of two isoforms of a receptor for the human hematopoietic cytokine Interleukin-11", BLOOD, (19951001), vol. 86, no. 7, pages 2534 - 2540, XP002000297 [PX] 1,2,4-9,29,30 * the whole document * | [A] - M. FOURCIN ET AL, "Involvement of gp130/interleukin-6 receptor transducing component in Interleukin-11 receptor", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (199401), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 277 - 280, XP002000298 [A] 19,20 * page 278, column R - page 279 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830240143 | [A] - YU-CHUNG YANG ET AL, "Interleukin-11 and its receptor", BIOFACTORS, (199212), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 15 - 21, XP002000299 [A] 13-15,19 * page 17 - page 18 * |