Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10510379 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | US9515517 | 27.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0796471 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2001 | B1 | EP0796471 | 30.06.1999 | A4 | EP0796471 | 24.09.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | US9515517 | 27.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2206845 | 16.01.2001 | C | CA2206845 | 13.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | US9515517 | 27.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69520598T | 05.09.2002 | T2 | DE69520598D1 | 10.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | US9515517 | 27.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1002971 | 30.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | US9515517 | 27.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9618163 | Global Dossier | 13.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5664110 | 02.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US35179594 | 08.12.1994 |