EP0796471 - Remote ordering system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/39] | REMOTE ORDERING SYSTEM | ||
[2000/13] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UBS AG Bahnhofstrasse 45 8001 Zürich / CH | [2006/26] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states HighPoint Systems, Inc. 10 Maguire Road, Suite 322 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states HighPoint Systems, Inc. 767 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | ||
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states HIGHPOINT SYSTEMS, INC. Suite 200, 74 Stone Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Jonathan, B. 74 Stone Road Belmont, MA 02178 / US | 02 /
POPE, William, R. 74 Highland Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Röthinger, Rainer, et al c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Bavariaring 26 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95942945.7 | 27.11.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US15517 | Priority number, date | US19940351795 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: US 351795 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618163 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796471 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796471 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06F17/60 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/39] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/39] | Title | German: | Fernbestellsystem und -methode | [2000/13] | English: | Remote ordering system and method | [2000/13] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de téléachat | [2000/13] |
Former [1997/39] | FERNBESTELLSYSTEM | ||
Former [1997/39] | REMOTE ORDERING SYSTEM | ||
Former [1997/39] | DISPOSITIF DE PASSAGE DE COMMANDE A DISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 27.01.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
10.05.2006
WITHDRAWN UBS AG Talstrasse 83 8001 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
10.05.2006
WITHDRAWN UBS AG Talstrasse 83 8001 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
17.01.2002
ADMISSIBLE UBS AG Talstrasse 83 8001 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Röthinger, Rainer c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2001
UBS AG Postfach 4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Röthinger, Rainer c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | 12.02.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.05.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/28] | Appeal following opposition | 25.09.2003 | Appeal received No. T1033/03 | 28.11.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4734858 (SCHLAFLY HUBERT J [US]) [Y] 1-75 * the whole document *; | [Y] - FEIGENOFF, CHARLES, "CD_ROM comes home: Bell Atlantic's intelligent home of the 21st century (home-based information services)", DIALOG FILE 148, Dialog Information Services, (199312), XP002101943 [Y] 1-75 * abstract * | [ ] - FEIGENOFF, CHARLES, "CD_ROM comes home: Bell Atlantic's intelligent home of the 21st century (home-based information services)", CD_ROM NEWS EXTRA, (199312), vol. V1, no. N6, page 16(4) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4734858 (SCHLAFLY HUBERT J [US]); | [Y]US5250789 (JOHNSEN EDWARD L [US]); | [Y]US5319542 (KING JR JOHN E [US], et al) | [Y] - VIDEODISC AND OPTICAL DISK, Volume 5, No. 4, July-August 1985, "News and Notes". |