EP0797622 - HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE WITH IMPROVED TEAR RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. P.O. Box 2149 Baytown, TX 77522-2149 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2149 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEST, Steven, Arthur 15702 Hillside Falls Houston, TX 77052 / US | 02 /
DANILUK, Thomas, Samyon 923 Chinquapin Place Houston, TX, 77094 / US | [1999/01] |
Former [1997/40] | 01 /
BEST, Steven, Arthur 16802 Doverwood Way Houston, TX 77058 / US | ||
02 /
DANILUK, Thomas, Samyon 24651 Nodding Flower Court Barrington, IL 60010 / US | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Europe Inc. P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [1997/40] | Bawden, Peter Charles, et al Exxon Chemical Ltd P O Box 1 Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943038.0 | 12.12.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995US15960 | Priority number, date | US19940354393 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: US 354393 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618678 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797622 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797622 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08J2323/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2314/02 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | HOCHDICHTES POLYETHYLEN MIT HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT, MIT VERBESSERTER REISSFESTIGKEIT | [1997/40] | English: | HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE WITH IMPROVED TEAR RESISTANCE | [1997/40] | French: | POLYETHYLENE DE POIDS MOLECULAIRE ET DE DENSITE ELEVES POSSEDANT UNE RESISTANCE AMELIOREE A LA DECHIRURE | [1997/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.1999 | CH | 10.03.1999 | ES | 10.03.1999 | GR | 10.03.1999 | IT | 10.03.1999 | LI | 10.03.1999 | SE | 10.03.1999 | DK | 10.06.1999 | PT | 11.06.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
CH | 10.03.1999 | ||
ES | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
LI | 10.03.1999 | ||
SE | 10.03.1999 | ||
DK | 10.06.1999 | ||
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
CH | 10.03.1999 | ||
ES | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
LI | 10.03.1999 | ||
SE | 10.03.1999 | ||
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
CH | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
LI | 10.03.1999 | ||
SE | 10.03.1999 | ||
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
CH | 10.03.1999 | ||
GR | 10.03.1999 | ||
LI | 10.03.1999 | ||
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
CH | 10.03.1999 | ||
LI | 10.03.1999 | ||
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
CH | 15.06.1999 | ||
LI | 15.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 10.03.1999 | |
PT | 11.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 10.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4770912 (FURRER WILLIAM W [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * see claims; figure1 *; | [A]EP0339990 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * see claims *; | [X]WO9119763 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 4,5,7 * see claims; page 9, table II; page 14, table V, blend B-3 and B-4 *; | [X]US5153039 (PORTER JAY P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * see claims; columns 3 and 4, examples 1 to 3 *; | [A]EP0517222 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-8* see claims * |