EP0796110 - SYSTEM FOR THE MAINTENANCE, GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN AND NON-HUMAN PRIMATE PLURIPOTENT STEM, PROGENITOR AND MATURE BONE MARROW CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mosca, Joseph D. 4201 Blue Barrow Ride Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | For all designated states Gartner, Suzanne 12305 Evermay Court North Potomac, MD 20878 / US | For all designated states KESSLER, Steven 1713 Valley View Avenue Belmont, CA 94002 / US | For all designated states La Russa, Vince 6125 Little Foxes Run Columbia, MD 21045 / US | For all designated states Hall, Eric NAMRU-3, PSC 452, Box 106 FPO, AE 09835-0007 / US | For all designated states Kaushal, Sumesh 18603 Fiddleleaf Terrace Olney, MD 20832 / US | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1997/39] | Bassett, Richard, et al ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95943042.2 | 08.12.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US15986 | Priority number, date | US19940352957 | 09.12.1994 Original published format: US 352957 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9617627 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0796110 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A01K67/027, C12N15/87 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP);
A01K67/0271 (EP);
A61K35/28 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR ERHALTUNG, WACHSTUM UND DIFFERENZIERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN UND NICHT- MENSCHLICHEN PLURIPOTENTEN STAMM ELTERLICHEN UND KNOCHENMARKZELLEN | [1997/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE MAINTENANCE, GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION OF HUMAN AND NON-HUMAN PRIMATE PLURIPOTENT STEM, PROGENITOR AND MATURE BONE MARROW CELLS | [1997/39] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A L'ENTRETIEN, LA CROISSANCE ET LA DIFFERENTIATION DE CELLULES DE MOELLE OSSEUSE PLURIPOTENTES SOUCHES, PARENTES ET A MATURITE, D'ORIGINE HUMAINE OU PROVENANT DE PRIMATES | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 29.04.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9211355 (REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN) [Y] 1-21 *see the whole patent* | [Y] - B.P. CHEN ET AL., "Engraftment of human hematopoietic precursor cells with secondary transfer potential in scid-hu mice", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, no. 8, pages 2497 - 2505, XP002012894 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole article* | [Y] - T.R. KOLLMANN ET AL., "Reconstitution of scid-mice with human lymphoid and myeloid cells after transplantation with human fetal bone marrow without the requirement of exogenous human cytokines", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 8032 - 8036, XP002012895 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole article* | [Y] - J.A. NOLTA ET AL., "Sustained human hematopoiesis in immunodeficient mice by cotransplantation of marrow stroma expressing human IL-3: analysis of gene transduction of long-lived progenitors", BLOOD, (1994), vol. 83, no. 10, pages 3041 - 3051, XP002012896 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole article* | [Y] - S. KYOIZUMI ET AL., "Implantation and mainteance of functional human bone marrow in scid-hu mice", BLOOD, (1992), vol. 79, no. 7, pages 1704 - 1711, XP002012897 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole article* | [Y] - S.R. PAUL ET AL., "Stromal cell-associated hematopoiesis: immortalization and characterisation of a primate bone marrow derived stromal cell line", BLOOD, (1991), vol. 77, no. 8, pages 1723 - 1733, XP002012898 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole article* | [Y] - Journal of Cellular Biochemistry, 1994, Suppl. 0 (18 Part A), 234, DZ 213, XP002012899 [Y] 1-21 *see the whole abstract* |