EP0799013 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DIVISIBLE TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBERG, Jörg Bruchstrasse 29 D-67158 Ellerstadt / DE | 02 /
MAIER, Werner Königsberger Strasse 9 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 03 /
FRICKE, Helmut Pfalzring 159 D-67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
BREITENBACH, Jörg Hans-Sachs-Ring 11 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95943202.2 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995EP05117 | Priority number, date | DE19944446470 | 23.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4446470 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619962 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799013 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799013 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/10, B30B11/16, A61K9/20 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B30B11/165 (EP,US);
A61J3/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/2072 (EP,US);
Y10S53/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEILBAREN TABLETTEN | [1997/41] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING DIVISIBLE TABLETS | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMPRIMES SECABLES | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Request for further processing for: | 22.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE232863 (KÖPPERN) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]DE395345 (DEUTSCHE MASCHF AG) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE1766546 (ERIKSSON KARL GUNNAR, et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4880585 (KLIMESCH ROGER G [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH683066 (GERGELY GERHARD [AT]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |