EP0746692 - CLIP DEVICE FOR FASTENING AN ELEMENT TO A SHEET METAL PORTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2002/17] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE DU, Pierre 14, rue des Aubiers F-35310 Chavagne / FR | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56A Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/50] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95943275.8 | 22.12.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995FR01731 | Priority number, date | FR19940015720 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415720 | [1996/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620349 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746692 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746692 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/24, F16L3/04 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B60R16/0222 (EP,US);
F16B2/245 (EP,US);
F16L3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ELEMENTS AN EINEM BLECHTEIL EINES FAHRZEUGS, SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1996/50] | English: | CLIP DEVICE FOR FASTENING AN ELEMENT TO A SHEET METAL PORTION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [1996/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF FORMANT AGRAFE DE FIXATION D'UN ELEMENT A UNE PARTIE EN TOLE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 24.07.2002 | [2002/42] | Cited in | International search | [A]US1860861 (KNUTSON CARL L) [A] 1,3 * column W *; | [A]FR861129 (RAYMOND) [A] 1,2,4,5* the whole document *; | [A]US2578639 (BEDFORD JR WILLIAM A) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column W *; | [XA]US3905070 (MACRAE RALPH) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 3-5; | [A]US4461387 (BELOKIN JR PAUL [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column W * |