EP0799098 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A STANDING SONIC WAVE, METHODS OF SONICATION WITH A STANDING SONIC WAVE, AND A STANDING SONIC WAVE SONICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALAKA, Folim, G. 42 South Lewis Avenue Waukegan, IL 60085 / US | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95943966.2 | 22.12.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995US16810 | Priority number, date | US19940362640 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: US 362640 | US19950564995 | 21.12.1995 Original published format: US 564995 | [1997/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619301 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799098 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799098 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B06B3/00, B01F11/02 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
B06B3/00 (EP,US);
B01F31/86 (EP,US);
C12N1/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON STEHENDEN SCHALLWELLEN,BESCHALLUNGSVERFAHREN MIT EINER STEHENDEN SCHALLWELLE,UND EINE STEHENDE SCHALLWELLE VERWENDENDE BESCHALLER | [1997/41] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING A STANDING SONIC WAVE, METHODS OF SONICATION WITH A STANDING SONIC WAVE, AND A STANDING SONIC WAVE SONICATOR | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE POUR GENERER UNE ONDE SONIQUE STATIONNAIRE, PROCEDES POUR EFFECTUER UN TRAITEMENT SONIQUE PAR UNE ONDE SONIQUE STATIONNAIRE ET APPAREIL POUR GENERER UNE ONDE SONIQUE STATIONNAIRE | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4571087 (RANNEY DAVID F [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0337690 (GENE TRAK SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP0394583 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]) [Y] 3* abstract *; | [X]WO9212807 (DUBRUQUE DOMINIQUE [FR]) [X] 5,8 * abstract * * claims 1-3,13 *; | [A]WO9303150 (AMOCO CORP [US]); | [X]EP0619147 (ARC SONICS INC [CA]) [X] 5,8 * abstract * |