EP0801583 - APPARATUS FOR STIMULATING PENILE, SCROTAL, ANAL, VAGINAL AND CLITORAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boutos, David 4420 East Dunlap Crossing Street Las Vegas, NV 89129 / US | [1997/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Shortt, Peter Bernard, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Shortt, Peter Bernard, et al TOMKINS & CO., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [1997/43] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95944166.8 | 19.12.1995 | [1997/43] | WO1995US16629 | Priority number, date | US19950369172 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: US 369172 | US19950553077 | 03.11.1995 Original published format: US 553077 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620753 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801583 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61N1/0524 (EP);
A61N1/0452 (EP);
A61N1/0456 (EP);
A61N1/0472 (EP);
A61N1/0512 (EP);
A61N1/36007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/43] | A61N1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWEBE-STIMULIERUNG IM GEBIET DES PENIS, DES SKROTUMS, DES ANUS, DER SCHEIDE UND DER KLITORIS | [1997/43] | English: | APPARATUS FOR STIMULATING PENILE, SCROTAL, ANAL, VAGINAL AND CLITORAL TISSUE | [1997/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE STIMULATION DES TISSUS DU PENIS, DU SCROTUM, DE L'ANUS, DU VAGIN ET DU CLITORIS | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 20.12.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5370671 (MAURER DONALD D ET AL) [A] 1-3,6-8,10,14 * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 13; figure - *; | [A]WO9324176 (TIPPEY KEITH EDWARD ;AXELGAARD JENS (US)) [A] 1-3,6-8,14 * page 4, line 18 - page 13, line 13; figure - * | International search | [AP]US5456709 ; | [AP]US5385577 |