EP0858615 - THERMOSETTING ANTI-REFLECTIVE COATINGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brewer Science Inc. 2401 Brewer Drive Rolla, Missouri 65401-0650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states Brewer Science, Inc. 2401 Brewer Drive Rolla, Missouri 65401 / US | ||
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Flaim, Tony D. Route 3, Box 3257 St. James, MO 65559 / US | ||
For all designated states Meador, Jim D. 1126 Grenadier Lane Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
For all designated states Shao, Xie Brewer Science, Inc., P.O. Box GG Rolla, MO 65401 / US | |||
For all designated states Brewer, Terry L. Brewer Science, Inc., P.O. Box GG Rolla, MO 65401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flaim, Tony D. Route 3, Box 3257 St. James, MO 65559 / US | 02 /
Meador, Jim D. 1126 Grenadier Lane Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | 03 /
Shao, Xie Brewer Science, Inc., P.O.Box GG Rolla, MO 65401 / US | 04 /
Brewer, Terry L. Brewer Science, Inc., P.O.Box GG Rolla, MO 65401 / US | [2000/16] |
Former [1998/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95944193.2 | 14.12.1995 | [1998/34] | WO1995US16728 | Priority number, date | US19950517089 | 21.08.1995 Original published format: US 517089 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707145 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858615 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858615 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/09 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
G03F7/004 (KR);
C08G59/1455 (EP,US);
C08G59/68 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
Y10S430/136 (EP,US);
Y10S522/904 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L61/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | G03F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/34] | Title | German: | THERMISCH HÄRTBARE ANTIREFLEXIONS BESCHICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [1998/34] | English: | THERMOSETTING ANTI-REFLECTIVE COATINGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [1998/34] | French: | REVETEMENT ANTI-REFLECTEUR THERMODURCISSABLE | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JP45021951B ; | [Y]US5366846 (KNUDSEN PHILIP D [US], et al) | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL on Questel, week 7031, London: Derwent Publications Ltd., AN 70-55585R; & JP,B,45 021 951 (KURASHIKI RAYON COMPANY)., & JP45021951B B 00000000 |