EP0750790 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPPING METALLIZATION LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, M/S D3-579 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 2900 Semiconductor Drive, M/S D3-579 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEILER, Peter, M. 3476 Greer Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Bowles, Sharon Margaret, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95944223.7 | 26.12.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995US16844 | Priority number, date | US19950372386 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: US 372386 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621944 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750790 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/485 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L24/03 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L2224/02166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04042 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05082 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05083 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05166 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05184 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05644 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1148 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48644 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48647 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01022 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01072 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01327 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/04042, H01L2924/00, H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48644, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABDECKEN EINER METALLISIERUNGSSCHICHT | [1997/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CAPPING METALLIZATION LAYER | [1997/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FORMATION D'UNE COUCHE DE METALLISATION | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/31] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/31] | Request for further processing for: | 09.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2004686 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1,3,5,10-12,21,24 * the whole document * [Y] 2,7,15,18,23; | [AY]JPS5516425 ; | [AY]US5136364 (BYRNE ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1,5-7,10-12,18,21 * column W * [Y] 15; | [A]JPH01166542 ; | [A]JPS63114145 ; | [A]JPS59172252 ; | [A]JPS6331138 ; | [A]EP0396276 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,10-12,21,23 * column A *; | [A]EP0339871 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800405), vol. 4, no. 44, Database accession no. (E - 005), & JP55016425 A 19800205 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,3,5,10,12,21,24 * abstract * [Y] 2,7,18,23 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891003), vol. 13, no. 439, Database accession no. (E - 827), & JP01166542 A 19890630 (FUJITSU) [A] 1,2,10,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880926), vol. 12, no. 357, Database accession no. (E - 662), & JP63114145 A 19880519 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,5,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850206), vol. 9, no. 27, Database accession no. (E - 294), & JP59172252 A 19840928 (HITACHI MAIKURO COMPUTER ENGINEERING KK) [A] 1,2,5,7,10,12,18,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880707), vol. 12, no. 239, Database accession no. (E - 630), & JP63031138 A 19880209 (FUJITSU) [A] 1,5,10,12 * abstract * |