EP0800578 - RECOMBINANT MONOCLONAL ANTI-IDIOTYPE ANTIBODY 3H1 SEQUENCES RELATING TO HUMAN CARCINOEMBRYONIC ANTIGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Kentucky Research Foundation Intellectual Property Development, A144 ASTeCC Building Lexington, KY 40506-0286 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states University of Kentucky Research Foundation Intellectual Property Development, A144 ASTeCC Building Lexington, KY 40506-0286 / US | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY Intellectual Property Development, A144 ASTeCC Building Lexington, KY 40506-0286 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Malaya 2400 The Woods Lane Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 02 /
KOHLER, Heinz 7547 Athens Lexington, KY 40509 / US | 03 /
CHATTERJEE, Sunil, K. 2400 The Woods Lane Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 04 /
FOON, Kenneth, A. 800 Rose Street Lexington, KY 40536-0093 / US | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95944450.6 | 28.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995US17103 | Priority number, date | US19940365484 | 28.12.1994 Original published format: US 365484 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9620277 | Date: | 04.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0800578 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800578 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12N15/86, C12N5/06, C07K16/42, C07K19/00, A61K39/395, A61K39/285, G01N33/68, G01N33/577, C12Q1/68, A61K48/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/535 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
C07K16/4266 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2799/023 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | REKOMBINIERTE SEQUENZEN DES MONOKLONALEN ANTI-IDIOTYPISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERS 3H1, DIEAN DEM MENSCHLICHEN KARZIOEMBYONISCHEN ANTIGEN LIIERT SIND | [1997/42] | English: | RECOMBINANT MONOCLONAL ANTI-IDIOTYPE ANTIBODY 3H1 SEQUENCES RELATING TO HUMAN CARCINOEMBRYONIC ANTIGEN | [1997/42] | French: | SEQUENCES DE L'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL DE RECOMBINAISON ANTI-IDIOTYPE 3H1 ASSOCIEES A L'ANTIGENE CARCINOEMBRIONIQUE HUMAIN | [1997/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 16.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |