EP0801570 - FORMULATIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING SKIN IRRITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensory Systems 4275 Executive Square, Suite 1000 La Jolla, CA 92037-1478 / US | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sensory Systems 4275 Executive Square Suite 100 La Jolla CA 92037-1478 / US | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states no data available | ||
For all designated states (deleted) ... | |||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Akcess Acquisition Group LLC 4370 La Jolla Village Drive, Suit 960 San Diego, California 92122 / US | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states COSMEDERM TECHNOLOGIES 3252 Holiday Court La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Gary Scott 2371 Lagoon View Drive Cardiff by the Sea, CA 92007 / US | 02 /
THUESON, David Orel 12740 Boxwood Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau, 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/21] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1997/43] | Schlee, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95944552.9 | 21.12.1995 | [1997/43] | WO1995US16990 | Priority number, date | US19940362101 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: US 362101 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619228 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801570 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801570 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/60, A61K33/06, A61K31/19 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
A61K8/671 (EP);
A61K33/06 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/20 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K2800/75 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/00 (EP);
A61Q9/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | A61K31/60, A61K31/61, A61K33/06, A61K31/19 | ||
Former IPC [1997/43] | A61K31/60, A61K31/61 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON HAUTIRRITATIONEN | [1997/43] | English: | FORMULATIONS AND METHODS FOR REDUCING SKIN IRRITATION | [1997/43] | French: | FORMULATIONS ET PROCEDES POUR DIMINUER L'IRRITATION DE LA PEAU | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 20.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.2005
15.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
08.09.2005
19.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Bernstein, Claire Jacqueline, et al, et al L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.2005
15.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
08.09.2005
19.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, Rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Bernstein, Claire Jacqueline, et al, et al L'Oréal D.I.P.I 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2005/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.09.2005
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
08.09.2005
L'OREAL 14, Rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Bernstein, Claire Jacqueline, et al, et al L'OREAL D.I.P.I 25-29, Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnieres-sur-Seine / FR | 13.10.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.03.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2004 | BE | 08.12.2004 | CH | 08.12.2004 | IT | 08.12.2004 | LI | 08.12.2004 | NL | 08.12.2004 | IE | 21.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | LU | 08.02.2005 | DK | 08.03.2005 | GR | 08.03.2005 | SE | 08.03.2005 | ES | 19.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2005 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 21.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
LI | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05117158 ; | [X]JPH045224 ; | [X]JPS63215635 ; | [X]JPH05123398 ; | [X]JPS61109725 ; | [X]JPH04230620 ; | [X]JPH05221823 ; | [X]JPH06135840 ; | [X]GB1072355 (MICHAEL COLLIN, et al) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15,17,19,21 * page 1, column L, line 14 - column R, line 87; claims 1-3 *; | [X]GB1334933 (AHRENS G W) [X] 1-7,17,19 * page 1, column R, lines 49-76 * * page 2, column L, line 62 - column R, line 83 * * page 6, column L, line 41 - page 7, column L, line 5 * * page 7, column L, line 51 - page 8, column R, line 44 *; | [X]US3865546 (ZEMLIN JOHN C, et al) [X] 1-9,15,17,21 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 17 *; | [X]US3984540 (WILLARD SR JOHN W) [X] 1-7,14-17 * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 48; examples 1,2,6; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4083965 (BLUHM HENRY P) [X] 1-8,12-17 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 19; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US4248861 (SCHUTT STEVEN R) [X] 1-17,19,21 * column 2, line 17 - column 7, line 16; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US4477439 (D ALELIO GAETANO F [US]) [X] 1-7,14-17 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 12; example 7; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0137743 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,17,19,21 * page 1, line 28 - page 3, line 27 ** page 4, line 5 - page 14, line 33; claims 1,9,10 *; | [X]EP0165430 (GOEDECKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0217975 (PSORI MED AG [CH]) [X] 1-8,12-15,17,19 * column 2, lines 19-40 * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 16; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US4735802 (LE BICH N [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,17,19,21 * the whole document *; | [X]US4917889 (CARTY BARBARA A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,14-17,19,21 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 57; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9209291 (FLOWERS MARIANNE [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,17,19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0520112 (JAPAN FINE CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15,17,19,21 * page 3, lines 37-44 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 43; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO9409798 (BONAPARTE CO [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15,17,19,21 * page 2, lines 17-28 * * page 3, lines 15-33 * * page 10, line 12 - page 12, line 14; examples 5,6,8-11; claims 1-13 * * page 4 *; | [X]WO9413305 (DEO CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,11,12,14,17,19 * page 8, lines 7-9 * * page 12, line 26 - page 13, line 18 * * page 14, line 8 - page 17, line 15; claims 1-5,7-10 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 24, Database accession no. 93-191439, XP002083718 & JPH05117158 A 19930514 (SASAKI KAGAKU YAKUHIN KK) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15,17,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 08, Database accession no. 92-060684, XP002083719 & JPH045224 A 19920109 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 42, Database accession no. 88-295926, XP002083720 & JPS63215635 A 19880908 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15,17,19,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 25, Database accession no. 93-199782, XP002083721 & JPH05123398 A 19930521 (KAMIYAMA T) [X] 1-6,14,15,17,19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 28, Database accession no. 86-178289, XP002083722 & JPS61109725 A 19860528 (MOGI K) [X] 1-8,12,14,15,17,18,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 40, Database accession no. 92-326751, XP002083723 & JPH04230620 A 19920819 (JINO KOSAN KK) [X] 1-7,12,14,15,17,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 39, Database accession no. 93-309091, XP002083724 & JPH05221823 A 19930831 (TEI T) [X] 1-15,17,19,21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 24, Database accession no. 94-196986, XP002083725 & JPH06135840 A 19940517 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-7,12-15,17,21 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5296476 (HENDERSON ESTHER G [US]) |