EP0800636 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING FUEL AND OXIDANT FROM A BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/42] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING FUEL AND OXIDANT FROM A BURNER | ||
[2000/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMBUSTION TEC. INC. 2501 Clark Street Apopka Florida 32703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states COMBUSTION TEC. Inc. 2501 Clark Street Apopka, Florida 32703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSHI, Mahendra, L. 1232 Timberland Trail Altamonte Springs, FL 32714 / US | 02 /
BROADWAY, Lee 1026 Hillcrest Court Eustis, FL 32726 / US | 03 /
MOHR, Patrick, J. 1000 Shellcracker Road Mims, FL 32754 / US | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Patentanwaltsbüro Feldmann AG Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 95944768.1 | 29.12.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995US17069 | Priority number, date | US19940366621 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: US 366621 | [1997/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621823 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800636 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800636 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/58, F23D14/22 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
F23D14/22 (EP,US);
F23D14/56 (EP,US);
F23C2201/20 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00006 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1997/42] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTRAG VON BRENNSTOFF UND OXIDATIONSMITTEL AUS EINEM BRENNER | [2000/12] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING FUEL AND OXIDANT FROM A BURNER | [2000/12] | French: | APPAREIL POUR DIFFUSER UN COMBUSTIBLE ET UN OXYDANT DEPUIS UN BRULEUR | [2000/12] |
Former [1997/42] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTRAG VON BRENNSTOFF UND OXIDATIONSMITTEL AUS EINEM BRENNER | ||
Former [1997/42] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING FUEL AND OXIDANT FROM A BURNER | ||
Former [1997/42] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DIFFUSER UN COMBUSTIBLE ET UN OXYDANT DEPUIS UN BRULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.12.2000 | DE | 07.03.2001 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/15] | DE | 07.03.2001 | |
FR | 04.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | FR | 04.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [XY]AU4719485B (TECHNOSEARCH PTY.) [X] 1,5,8,15 [Y] 6,7,16,17; | [YA]US4504213 (MARKUS GERARDUS A [NL]) [Y] 6,7,16,17 [A] 1,5,8,15; | [A]EP0513414 (HOTWORK INT SA [LU]) [A] 2-4,10-14 |