EP0792472 - TARGET ACQUIRING TELESCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netzer, Yishay 112 Yuvalim 20142 Doar Na Misgav / IL | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETZER, Yishay 112 Yuvalim 20142 Israel / IL | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95944837.4 | 26.10.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US13896 | Priority number, date | IL19290941114 | 27.10.1994 Original published format: IL 94111429 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9626415 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0792472 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/00, G02B23/18, G02B27/01, G02C7/08 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B23/18 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (EP);
G02C7/088 (EP);
G02B2027/0132 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/0143 (EP);
G02B2027/0154 (EP);
G02B2027/0156 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G02C7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/36] | Title | German: | TELESKOP ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ZIELES | [1997/36] | English: | TARGET ACQUIRING TELESCOPE | [1997/36] | French: | TELESCOPE D'ACQUISITION DE CIBLE | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/45] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US1610553 (JONES BYRON Q) [Y] 1,2,5,16,19 * the whole document * [A] 4,7,20; | [YA]US4465347 (TASK HARRY L [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,16,19 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,9; | [A]US4704000 (PEKAR JAROSLAW [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0500378 (FRONT ROW PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YA]WO9311454 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU]) [Y] 1,2,5,16,19 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,6,10,11 | International search | [Y]US3051046 (THOMPSON KENNETH B); | [Y]US4673263 (ONUFRYK MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US5052790 (EDWARDS D BRANDON [US], et al); | [Y]AU8540491 (OPTICS AND VISION LTD); | [Y]EP0544174 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) |