EP0723254 - Emergency call installation with exchange of information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ms Neumann Elektronik GmbH Mainstrasse 1 D-45478 Mülheim / DE | [2005/02] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states Neumann Elektronik GmbH Mainstrasse 1 D-45478 Mülheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Dirk Schemelsbruch 11 D-45478 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100140.1 | 08.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | DE1995101440 | 19.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19501440 | [1996/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723254 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723254 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/01 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
G08B25/016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, NL [1996/30] | Title | German: | Informations-Notrufanlage | [1996/30] | English: | Emergency call installation with exchange of information | [1996/30] | French: | Installation d'appel de secours avec échange d'information | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 12.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2000
24.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2000
24.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2000
24.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 14.09.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.03.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.02.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.11.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/12] | Appeal following opposition | 28.03.2002 | Appeal received No. T0335/02 | 14.06.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 25.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2610467 (AREA AUTOROUTES RHONE ALPES [FR]) [Y] 1,5,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]WO8202704 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [A] 2 * page 1, line 23 - page 3, line 14 *; | [A]US4737776 (WIREMAN WALLACE [US]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]DE2406267 (NEUMANN ELEKTRONIK GMBH) [A] 6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2440129 (CLAVEL ROGER) [A] * page 2, line 26 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [PA]DE29500773U (NEUMANN ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [PA] * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4318505 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | [Y] - SPITERI J C ET AL, "RAU 42 NOUVEAU RESEAU D'APPEL D'URGENCE", COMMUTATION ET TRANSMISSION, (19900101), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 69 - 80, XP000136356 [Y] 1,5,15,16 * page 76, column M * |