EP0721059 - Butterfly valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Minoru c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | [1996/28] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100171.6 | 08.01.1996 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | JP19950001318 | 09.01.1995 Original published format: JP 131895 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721059 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721059 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0721059 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/22, F01N1/16, F01N1/02 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
F01N1/023 (EP,US);
F01N1/02 (EP,US);
F01N1/084 (EP,US);
F01N1/089 (EP,US);
F01N1/166 (EP,US);
F01N2490/155 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/28] | F01N1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/28] | Title | German: | Klappenventil | [1996/28] | English: | Butterfly valve | [1996/28] | French: | Vanne papillon | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06248929 ; | [DA]JPH05156920 ; | [A]JPH0688514 ; | [A]EP0443181 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 24; figure 8 * * page 8, line 14 - line 17 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941206), vol. 018, no. 640, Database accession no. (M - 1717), & JP06248929 A 19940906 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,5-7,12,13,15-19 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931007), vol. 017, no. 558, Database accession no. (M - 1493), & JP05156920 A 19930622 (SANGO:KK) [DA] 1,2,5,7,15-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940704), vol. 018, no. 352, Database accession no. (M - 1631), & JP06088514 A 19940329 (SANGO CO LTD) [A] 1,15 * abstract * |