EP0723843 - Dispensing head for two-component foam with shutoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [1996/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wacker, Robert L. 30285 Mosher Road Wellington, Ohio 44090 / US | 02 /
Hoversten, William R. 3879 Oneida Street Stow, Ohio 44224 / US | 03 /
Peters, Gerald 180 Collega Park T-3 Elyria, Ohio 44035 / US | 04 /
Reep, Dan 640 Elyria Avenue Amherst, Oho 44001 / US | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100330.8 | 11.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | US19950379976 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: US 379976 | US19950578066 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: US 578066 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723843 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723843 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/76, B05B7/26, B29B7/40 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
B29C44/3442 (EP);
B29B7/407 (EP);
B29B7/7404 (EP);
B29B7/7414 (EP);
B29B7/7442 (EP);
B29B7/7615 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1996/31] | B29B7/76, B05B7/26 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | Abgabekopf für Zweikomponentenschaum mit Abstellvorrichtung | [1996/31] | English: | Dispensing head for two-component foam with shutoff | [1996/31] | French: | Tête de distribution de mousse à deux composants avec dispositif d'arrêt | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3482822 (KRIZAK EUGENE J ET AL) [X] 1 * column 7, line 71 - column 8, line 44; figure 2; claim 1 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]US3222134 (PETERSON) [X] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]US3035775 (EDWARDS ET AL.) [X] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 70; figure - *; | [X]US3684250 (ROESER JOHN O) [X] 1 * column 7, line 4 - line 23; figure 5 *; | [Y]FR2085834 (THE DENVER BRICK AND PIPE CO) [Y] 2 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 22; figures 1,3; claim 1 *; | [YA]FR2250619 (LOUIS ROGER) [Y] 3 * figure -; claim - * [A] 5-9; | [A]FR2283733 (GRACE W R LTD) [A] 3,5 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]GB1073571 (PFIZER LTD) [A] 5 * page 3, line 73 - line 92 *; | [A]US3239100 (PETERSON) [A] 5 * column 8, line 8 - line 44; figure 5 *; | [A]DE2513662 (BAER MASCHF JOSEF) [A] 1,3,5 * page 8, line 1 - line 13; figures 1,5 * |