EP0722067 - Heat recovery apparatus by fluidized bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO also known as Kobe Steel Ltd. 3-18 1-chome, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO also known as Kobe Steel Ltd. 3-18 1-chome, Wakinohama-cho Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suyari, Mamoru, Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, 1-chome, Takatsuka-dai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-22 / JP | 02 /
Ogura, Kenzo, Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-18, 1-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Tadashi, Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, 1-chome, Takatsuka-dai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-22 / JP | 04 /
Shiraishi, Yukihiro, c/o Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-18, 1-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651 / JP | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100354.8 | 11.01.1996 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | JP19950185972 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18597295 | JP19950154471 | 21.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15447195 | JP19950003576 | 12.01.1995 Original published format: JP 357695 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0722067 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0722067 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/46, F23G5/30, F23C11/02 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
F23C10/12 (EP,KR);
F23G5/30 (EP,KR);
F23G5/46 (EP,KR);
F23G2203/50 (KR);
F23G2203/502 (EP);
F23G2206/20 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/29] | Title | German: | Wärmerückgewinnungseinrichtung für Wirbelbett | [1996/29] | English: | Heat recovery apparatus by fluidized bed | [1996/29] | French: | Dispositif de récupération de chaleur pour lit fluidisé | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/03] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5313913 (OHSHITA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 24 * * column 7, line 1 - line 35; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0243156 (BURMEISTER & WAINS ENERGI [DK]) [A] 5,6 * column 3, line 17 - line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH0297814 ; | [A]EP0369004 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 18, line 3 - page 22, line 14; figures 3,4,13,14 *; | [A]EP0230309 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [D]JPS63187001 (EBARA CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900628), vol. 014, no. 300, Database accession no. (M - 0991), & JP02097814 A 19900410 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 4 * abstract * |