EP0724031 - System for carding textile fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDERIE OFFICINE RIUNITE F.O.R. ING. GRAZIANO DI L. GRAZIANO & C. S.a.s. Via F. Nazionale 3 13051 Biella / IT | [1997/43] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states FONDERIE OFFICINE RIUNITE ING. GRAZIANO DI L. GRAZIANO & C. S.a.s. Via F. Nazionale 3 I-13051 Biella (Vercelli) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bacchio, Giovanni Via Roma 52 I-13053 Mongrando (Vercelli) / IT | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1996/31] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96100520.4 | 16.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00050 | 26.01.1995 Original published format: IT TO950050 | [1996/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724031 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724031 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D01G21/00, D01G25/00, D04H18/00 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
D04H18/02 (EP,US);
D01G21/00 (EP,US);
D01G25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/31] | Title | German: | System zum Kardieren von Textilfasern | [1996/31] | English: | System for carding textile fibres | [1996/31] | French: | Système pour le cardage de fibres textiles | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 12.10.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1940699 (ATLAS MAK MASCHINENBAU GMBH) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO9204492 (AEROSPACE PREFORMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 2 * page 6, line 7 - page 10, line 3; figures 1,4; claims 1-3 * [A] 4-6; | [XAY]WO9315247 (FIBERWEB NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 13 - page 18, line 5; figure 2; claims 5,11,21 * [A] 6 [Y] 2; | [A]DE4234354 (DILO KG MASCHF OSKAR [DE]) [A] 1,2,4* the whole document * |