EP0723031 - High-density bulky body of amorphous alloy excellent in strength and magnetic property and joining method for manufacturing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Okazaki, Kenji 62 Candlewood Drive Nicholasville Kentucky 40356 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states NISSHIN STEEL CO., LTD. 4-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states Okazaki, Kenji 62 Candlewood Drive Nicholasville, Kentucky 40356 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saida, Junji, c/o Steel & Tech. Dev. Lab. Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Koya-Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken 272 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Yosuke, c/o Steel & Tech. Dev. Lab. Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Koya-Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken 272 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Yasuji, c/o Steel & Tech. Dev. Lab. Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Koya-Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken 272 / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Ayako, c/o Steel & Tech. Dev. Lab. Nisshin Steel Co., Ltd., 7-1, Koya-Shinmachi Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken 272 / JP | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100557.6 | 16.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | JP19950022288 | 17.01.1995 Original published format: JP 2228895 | JP19950297342 | 20.10.1995 Original published format: JP 29734295 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723031 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723031 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723031 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22C45/00, B22F3/087, B22F3/00 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
B22F3/006 (EP);
B22F3/087 (EP);
B23K20/10 (EP);
C22C45/00 (EP);
H01F1/15358 (EP);
H01F41/0213 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F3/006, B22F3/105 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/30] | C22C45/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/30] | Title | German: | Sinterkörper mit hoher Dichte aus einer Amorph-Legierung mit hoher Festigkeit und magnetischen Eigenschaften und Verbindungsverfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1996/30] | English: | High-density bulky body of amorphous alloy excellent in strength and magnetic property and joining method for manufacturing thereof | [1996/30] | French: | Corps fritté à haute densité élévée d'une alliage amorphes avec une haute résistance mécanique et d'excellentes propriétés magnétiques, et procédé de liaison pour sa production | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4929415 (OKAZAKI KENJI) [X] 1-4 *col.2, lines 37-60, col.3, lines 24-26, col.4, lines 22-24, col.5, lines 32-35 and claims* [A] 5; | [AD]EP0464275 (CHINA STEEL CORP ;LI JAMES CHEN MIN (US)) [AD] 1-5 *claims*; | [XA] - KIM, Y.-W., "Consolidation of metallic glass ribbons and powder using a pulsed high current discharge", DISS. ABSTR. INT., UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS, (198809), vol. 49, no. 3, page 879B, XP000569891 [X] 1-4 *see entire abstracts* [A] 5 | [A] - HUANG,D.-R., LI,J.C.M., "Stress relief of amorphous Fe78B13Si9 ribbon by rapid joule heating", SCRIPTA METALLURGICA ET MATERIALIA, (199006), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1137 - 1142, XP000569900 [A] 1-5 *Experimental, results and discussion* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-716X(90)90313-6 | [A] - HUANG, D.-R., LI, J.C.M., "High frequency magnetic properties of an amorphous Fe78B13Si9 ribbon improved by AC joule heating.", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A. CONFERENCE:SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RAPIDLY QUENCHED MATERIALS, 13-17/8/90., STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN, (19910315), vol. a133, pages 209 - 212, XP000569936 [A] 1-5 | Examination | - Kim, Y.W., "Consolidation of Metallic Glass Ribbons Using Electric Discharge Welding", Met. Trans. A, Vol. 19A, June 1988, pages 1634-1638. |