EP0725159 - Coating process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funk, Wilhelm, Dr. Brückenstrasse 5c CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [1996/32] | Application number, filing date | 96100605.3 | 17.01.1996 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | CH19950000253 | 31.01.1995 Original published format: CH 25395 | [1996/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725159 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725159 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/06 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
C23C4/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C4/04 (KR);
C23C4/08 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (KR);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/32] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsverfahren | [1996/32] | English: | Coating process | [1996/32] | French: | Procédé de revêtement | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.03.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   11.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2188251 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10,14,15 * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 27; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US4396473 (HUGHES GARY N, et al) [X] 1,7,10 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]US2570649 (CHARLES DAVIDOFF) [X] 1,2,4,10,14 * column 5, line 26 - line 67 *; | [X]GB1288326 (CHELYABINSKY TRAKTORNY ZAVOD IMENI V.I. LENINA) [X] 1,3,8,10 * page 1, line 21 - line 39; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US3274007 (JONES FRANCIS L) [X] 1,2,4,10 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US3378391 (WINZELER JOHN W, et al) [X] 1,10 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4327155 (HANNEMAN RODNEY E) [A] 1,10,14,15 * column 2, line 57 - line 68; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0383204 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3,7,10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 19 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 58; claims 1-23 *; | [A]US4578310 (HATFIELD RAYMOND W [US]) [A] 1,10 * figure 1; claims 1,4,7 *; | [AD]EP0054165 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [AD] 1,10 * claims 1-7 *; | [PX]EP0669299 (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [PX] 1,10 * claims 1,14,24-27,40-48 * |