EP0733513 - A vehicle impact sensor arrangement for detecting a side impact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG 447 83 Vargarda / SE | ||
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG S-447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruse, Dion Viktoriagatan 12 S-441 33 Alingsas / SE | 02 /
Haland, Yngve Fagelstracket 24 S-230 11 Falsterbo / SE | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100775.4 | 19.01.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | US19950409824 | 24.03.1995 Original published format: US 409824 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733513 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733513 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B60R21/23138 (EP,US);
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R21/0136 (EP,US);
B60R21/33 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0006 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/39] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugseitenaufprallsensor | [1996/39] | English: | A vehicle impact sensor arrangement for detecting a side impact | [1996/39] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'impact latéral pour véhicule | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2266075 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1403597 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4226869 (NIPPON SOKEN [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 7, line 1 - line 21 *; | [A]DE4115560 (GEN ENGINEERING BV [NL]) [A] 7 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [PX]GB2289448 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [PX] 1,2 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * | [A] - GUIDO WETZEL, "Steuerung eines Mehrfach-Rückhaltesystems", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19941001), vol. 96, no. 10, pages 618 - 619, XP000469483 [A] 1 * the whole document * |