EP0723027 - Device for heating rods or wires with periodically changing diameters while passing through induction coils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bredtmann-Girke Industrieofenbau GmbH Resselstrasse 5 45663 Recklinghausen / DE | [1996/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emig, Axel, Dipl.-Ing. Höcherstrasse 12 DE-66914 Waldmohr / DE | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Vièl, Christof Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Postfach 65 04 03 66143 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Vièl, Christof Patentanwälte VIEL & VIEL Weinbergweg 15 D-66119 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100795.2 | 19.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | DE1995101793 | 21.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19501793 | [1996/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723027 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723027 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/60, C21D1/42, // H05B6/02 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
C21D1/42 (EP);
C21D9/60 (EP);
C21D9/0075 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Erwärmen von Stäben und Draht mit Abschnitten periodisch sich verändernder Durchmesser im Durchlauf durch Induktionsspulen | [1996/30] | English: | Device for heating rods or wires with periodically changing diameters while passing through induction coils | [1996/30] | French: | Dispositif pour le chauffage de fils et de barres ayant des sections à diamètres périodiquement variables, en marche continu à travers un inducteur | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 07.12.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0097408 (PARK OHIO INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | [A]FR2498407 (DAI ICHI HIGH FREQUENCY CY LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2418601 (TOCCO STEL [FR]); | [A]FR2242469 (JAEGER [FR]); | [A]JPH04232210 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921221), vol. 016, no. 581, Database accession no. (C - 1012), & JP04232210 A 19920820 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |