EP0717112 - Method and apparatus for testing MAI (Mycobacterium Avium-Intracellulare) for antibiotic sensitivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INFECTECH, INC. 1125 Cornelia Lane P.O. Box 1092 Milford, PA 18337 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | For all designated states INFECTECH, INC. 1125 Cornelia Lane P.O. Box 1092 Milford, PA 18337 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ollar, Robert A. 499 Ocean Parkway Brooklyn, NY 11218 / US | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96100851.3 | 16.10.1990 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | US19890426573 | 24.10.1989 Original published format: US 426573 | [1996/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717112 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717112 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/18 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/18 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/5695 (EP,US);
G01N2333/35 (EP,US);
Y10S435/863 (EP,US);
Y10S435/864 (EP,US);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Untersuchung von MAI (Myocobacterium Avium-Intracellulare) auf Antibiotikumsensitivität | [1998/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for testing MAI (Mycobacterium Avium-Intracellulare) for antibiotic sensitivity | [1996/25] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour éprouver MAI (Mycobacterium Avium-Intracellulare) pour la sensibilité antibiotique | [1996/25] |
Former [1996/25] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Untersuchung MAI (Myocobacterium Avium-Intracellulare) für Antibiotikumsensitivität | Examination procedure | 22.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90916606.8 / EP0497876 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 22.01.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.1996 | 22.01.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - R.A. OLLAR, "A parffin baiting technique that enables a direct microscopic view of "in situ" morphology of Nocardia asteroides with the acid-fast or fluorescence staining procedure.", ZENTRALBLATT FÜR BAKTERIOLOGIE, PARASITENKUNDE, INFEKTIONSKRANKHEITEN UND HYGIENE. ERSTE ABTEILUNG ORIGINALE. REIHE A. MEDIZINISCHE MIKROBIOLOGIE UND PARASITOLOGIE., BONN FRG, vol. 71, pages 81 - 90, XP000567686 [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * | [T] - R.A. OLLAR ET AL., "A modified broth dilution assay for antibiotic sensitivity testing of Mycobacterium avium-intracellulare using paraffin slide cultures.", TUBERCLE, LONDON UK, (19910901), vol. 72, no. 3, pages 198 - 205, XP000567695 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-3879(91)90008-G | [T] - R.A. OLLAR ET AL., "The use of paraffin wax metabolism in the speciation of Mycobacterium avium-intracellulare.", TUBERCLE, LONDON UK, (19900301), vol. 71, pages 23 - 28, XP000567692 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-3879(90)90056-E |