EP0723856 - Plastic film particularly for pouch-like packages with improved tearability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURGOPACK STAMPA, TRASFORMAZIONE, IMBALLAGGI S.p.A. Via Dalmastro, 2 I-36030 Lugo Di Vicenza Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states BURGOPACK STAMPA, TRASFORMAZIONE, IMBALLAGGI S.p.A. Via Dalmastro, 2 I-36030 Lugo Di Vicenza, Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visona, Sergio Via Matteotti 52 I-36010 Chiuppano, Vicenza / IT | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96100891.9 | 22.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | IT1995PD00023 | 25.01.1995 Original published format: IT PD950023 | [1996/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723856 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723856 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723856 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29D7/01, B29C47/00, // B29K23:00 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
B29D7/01 (EP);
B29C48/00 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | Kunststofffolie mit verbesserter Rissanfälligkeit besonders für Verpackungbeutel | [1996/31] | English: | Plastic film particularly for pouch-like packages with improved tearability | [1996/31] | French: | Film plastique avec tendance à la déchirure améliorée particulièrement pour sachets d'emballage | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | IE | 22.01.2003 | LU | 22.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | [2012/50] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
LU | 22.01.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
LU | 22.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4311752 (DIEDRICH BERND, et al) [X] 1-7 * tables 1,2 *; | [X]US4554120 (RAMAMURTHY ARAKALGUD V [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 12, line 5 - line 11 * * column 13, line 42 - line 44 *; | [X]US4671918 (TOMO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * tables 1,2 *; | [A]US4828906 (NISHIMURA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* example 1 *; | [A]EP0372886 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [A] 7 * page 7, line 10 - line 13 *; | [A]US5241030 (BARRY RUSSELL P [CH], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [A]US5262228 (KOHYAMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * claim 2 * |